+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/23
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/22
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Schaible Wobbema Conley
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Heinert Pyle Guggisberg
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee