+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/13
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/13
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 6
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 03:30
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
- Received from House
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 61 nays 32
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 4 1
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee