+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/23
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/22
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:30
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee