+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/24
On April 19, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 9
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Patten Rust Bakke
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Paur Becker M. Nelson
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 8
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Request return from committee
- Rereferred to Transportation
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor