+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 26
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 3 0
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 18
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor