+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
- Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 31 nays 16
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
- Received from House
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee