+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
On March 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/15
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 3, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 6
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee