+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/27
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/27
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor