+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/19
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 15
- Concurred
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 6
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
- Received from House
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 18
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Judiciary
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 6 1
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee