+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/04
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/04
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment proposed on floor
- Amendment adopted
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 3
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
- Received from House
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 2
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor