+ − Full Texts (14)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Veto sustained, yeas 49 nays 39
- Consideration of Governor's veto
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 64 nays 29
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 24 nays 19
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Conference committee report rejected
- Request return from committee
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred to conference committee
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Casper Roers Marcellais
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Sukut Lefor Boschee
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 5
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 1
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:45
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
- Received from House
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 55 nays 37
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee