+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 24
- Reconsidered
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 25 nays 20
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 17
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor