+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 27, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/26
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 53 nays 40
- Concurred
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Division of bill
- Division A lost
- Division B adopted
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 32 nays 15
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0
On March 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
On February 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 50 nays 41
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 6 0
On January 27, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee