+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 8
- Concurred
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 4
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:45
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
- Received from House
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 5
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee