+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 42 nays 47
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 1
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Rereferred to Finance and Taxation
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 1
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee