+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/12
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
- Concurred
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause carried
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
- Received from House
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor