+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/30
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/29
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 34 nays 13
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 1
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Judiciary
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 1
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 03:00
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor