+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 41 nays 53
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee