+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/11
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
On March 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0
On March 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:40
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
On February 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3
- Committee Hearing 08:00
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee