+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/25
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
On March 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 6, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee