+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/26
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 36 nays 11
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 7
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee report rejected
On April 19, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Kannianen Cook Dotzenrod
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Dockter Headland Mitskog
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 27 nays 18
- Reconsidered
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 63 nays 24
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 6 0
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor