+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/25
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
On February 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 19 1 1
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On January 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 6, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee