+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/23
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/23
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 40 nays 7
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 12
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Myrdal Luick Dwyer
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Satrom Vetter Hanson
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 36 nays 9
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 13
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 03:00
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor