+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 42
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor