+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/13
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/13
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
- Received from House
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee