+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/10
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/10
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 9
- Concurred
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 39 nays 8
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
- Received from House
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 9
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor