+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/02
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/02
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 2
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee