+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto sustained, yeas 13 nays 33
- Consideration of Governor's veto
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Passed over veto, yeas 84 nays 7
- Consideration of Governor's veto
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 36 nays 10
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
- Received from House
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee