+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/07
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/07
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 8
- Concurred
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 31 nays 14
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
- Received from House
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 11
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee