+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 83
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 2 3
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee