+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On February 3, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 85
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 3 2
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On January 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee