+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/21
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 1
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
- Received from House
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:00
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee