+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor
- Request return from committee
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
- Received from House
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 21
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 3 3
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee