+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 30 nays 61
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 5 1
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee