+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/13
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/12
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 0 2
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 3
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee