+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/27
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/26
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:00
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee