+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 86
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 17 0 4
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee