+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/16
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/16
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 10, Emergency clause carried
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 2 2
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor