+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/10
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
- Concurred
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 1
- Emergency clause carried
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 01:30
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 0
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:45
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee