+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/31
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 6
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor