+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/22
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/21
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede)
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede)
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Dwyer Fors Bakke
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Roers Jones Karls Buffalo
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor