+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 71
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 18 1 2
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Reported back, do pass 12 1 1
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee