+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/12
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor