+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/31
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
- Received from House
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 11
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor