+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
- Signed by Governor 04/24
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:15
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
+ − Sponsor
Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor