+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/03
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/02
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:15
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
+ − Sponsor
Industry, Business and Labor
Type:
Primary Sponsor