+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/23
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 7
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Myrdal Lemm Bakke
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed McWilliams Buffalo Magrum
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 10
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor