+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/19
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 13
- Concurred
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 2
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
- Received from House
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 17
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 8 3
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
+ − Sponsor
Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor