+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/27
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/26
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 0 6
On January 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee