+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/28
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On February 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On January 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor